EP0251536 - Benzimidazoles, their production, formulation and use as gastric acid secretion inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cox, David 3 Belvoir Drive Loughborough Leicestershire, LE11 2SN / GB | 02 /
Hall, David Edward 81 Brooke Street Wymeswold Leicestershire, LE12 6TT / GB | 03 /
Ingall, Anthony Howard 53 Forest Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3NW / GB | 04 /
Suschitzky, John Louis 73 Kirkstone Drive Loughborough Leicestershire / GB | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae FISONS plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae FISONS plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305207.0 | 12.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | GB19860015416 | 24.06.1986 Original published format: GB 8615416 | GB19860015417 | 24.06.1986 Original published format: GB 8615417 | GB19860015418 | 24.06.1986 Original published format: GB 8615418 | GB19860015419 | 24.06.1986 Original published format: GB 8615419 | GB19870002683 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: GB 8702683 | GB19870002685 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: GB 8702685 | GB19870002686 | 06.02.1987 Original published format: GB 8702686 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0251536 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/28, C07D491/04, C07D498/04, A61K31/415, // C07C43/205, C07C79/35, C07C95/08, C07C91/40 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C07D235/28 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Benzimidazole, ihre Herstellung, Formulierung und Verwendung als Magensäuresekretionshemmer | [1988/01] | English: | Benzimidazoles, their production, formulation and use as gastric acid secretion inhibitors | [1988/01] | French: | Benzimidazoles, leur préparation, formulation et utilisation comme inhibiteurs de sécrétion d'acide gastrique | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 25.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/29] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/29] | Request for further processing for: | 28.02.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2163747 (NIPPON CHEMIPHAR CO); | [A]EP0174717 (FISONS PLC [GB]); | [AP]EP0204215 (SEARLE & CO [US]); | [XP]WO8701114 (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]); | [AP]EP0213474 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0218336 (NIPPON CHEMIPHAR CO [JP]) |