EP0250248 - Block copolymer, method of making the same, diamine precursors of the same method, method of making such diamines and end products comprising the block copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leir, Charles M Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St.PAul Minnesota 55133 / US | 02 /
Hoffman, Jerome J Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St.PAul Minnesota 55133 / US | 03 /
Tushaus, Leonard A Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St.PAul Minnesota 55133 / US | 04 /
Wiederholt, Gary T Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St.PAul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | [1996/23] |
Former [1987/52] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87305431.6 | 18.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | US19860876918 | 20.06.1986 Original published format: US 876918 | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250248 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250248 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250248 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/54, C08G18/38, C08G18/73, C08G18/74, C09J183/10 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C08G18/61 (EP);
C08G77/54 (KR);
C08G18/38 (KR);
C08G77/458 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/52] | C08G77/54, C08G18/38, C08G18/73, C08G18/74, C09J3/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Blockcopolymer, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, Diaminvorprodukte für dieses Verfahren bzw. Verfahren zu deren Herstellung sowie das Blockcopolymer enthaltende Endprodukte | [1997/45] | English: | Block copolymer, method of making the same, diamine precursors of the same method, method of making such diamines and end products comprising the block copolymer | [1987/52] | French: | Copolymère séquencé, sa préparation, diamines comme précurseurs pour sa préparation, méthode pour la préparation de ces diamines et produits finals contenant ce copolymère séquencé | [1987/52] |
Former [1987/52] | Blockcopolymer, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, Diaminvorprodukte für das gleiche Verfahren, Verfahren zur Herstellung solcher Diamine und dieses Blockcopolymer enthaltende Endprodukte | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/32: Teilanmeldung 96107085.1 eingereicht am 06/05/96 | EPB 1996/32: Divisional application 96107085.1 filed on 06/05/96 | EPB 1996/32: Demande divisionnaire 96107085.1 déposée le 06/05/96 | Examination procedure | 27.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP96107085.1 / EP0737700 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0078958 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | US4570010 [ ] (STUBER FRED A [US], et al) | Examination | - W.Noll, Chemie und Technologie der Silicone, 2. Ed. (1968), Verlag Chemie, p. 89 | - POLYMER, vol. 25, December 1984, pages 1800-1816, Butterworths I. YILGOR et al.: "Segmented organosiloxane copolymers. 1. Synthesis of siloxane-urea copolymers" |