EP0251695 - Injectable implant composition having improved intrudability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLLAGEN CORPORATION 2500 Faber Place Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallace, Donald G. 387 Hedge Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | 02 /
Reihanian, Hertsel 2201 Laguna Road, Apartment 409 San Francisco California 94115 / US | 03 /
Pharriss, Bruce B. 436 Lincoln Avenue Palo Alto California 94301 / US | 04 /
Braun, William G. 18 Farm Road Los Altos California 94022 / US | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305651.9 | 24.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | US19860878418 | 25.06.1986 Original published format: US 878418 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251695 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251695 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A61K37/12 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61L27/24 (EP,US);
A61L27/26 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61F2/0059 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00365 (EP,US);
A61L2400/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Injizierbare Implantationszusammensetzung mit verändertem Eindringvermögen | [1988/01] | English: | Injectable implant composition having improved intrudability | [1988/01] | French: | Composition d'implantation injectable à pouvoir d'intrusion modifié | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/11] | 20.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.08.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0083868 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]); | [A]EP0089145 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) |