EP0252655 - Passenger-carrying vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.1989 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METROCAB LIMITED P.O.Box 255 Washwood Heath Birmingham B8 2UH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states METROCAB LIMITED P.O.Box 255 Washwood Heath Birmingham B8 2UH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steadman, Peter Stanley Roman Way Roman Road Little Aston Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B74 3AR / GB | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Duncan, Angus Henry, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Duncan, Angus Henry, et al Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305675.8 | 25.06.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | GB19860016761 | 09.07.1986 Original published format: GB 8616761 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252655 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252655 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/00 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
A61G3/061 (EP);
A61G3/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, LU, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Fahrzeuge für Passagiertransport | [1988/02] | English: | Passenger-carrying vehicles | [1988/02] | French: | Véhicules de transport de passagers | [1988/02] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/01] | 07.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.06.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2233262 ; | [Y]GB604929 ; | [A]US4043468 ; | [A]US2798445 ; | [AD]EP0214838 |