EP0298165 - System and method for measuring ice thickness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pridham, Roger G. 19 Roslyn Avenue Providence, Rhode Island / US | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Jackson, David Spence, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87305987.7 | 07.07.1987 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298165 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298165 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/08, G01S15/88, G01B17/02 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
G01S15/88 (EP,US);
G01B17/00 (EP,US);
G01B17/02 (EP,US);
G01S15/08 (EP,US);
G01S15/34 (EP,US);
G01S7/534 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Messen der Eisdicke | [1989/02] | English: | System and method for measuring ice thickness | [1989/02] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour mesurer l'épaisseur de la glace | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3532372 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US3870988 (TURNER WILLIAM R); | [A]US4282589 (EVETTS SAMUEL G, et al); | [A]US4328568 (WEBB HERBERT H); | [A]DE962589 (ELECTROACUSTIC GMBH) | [A] - ELECTRONICS, vol. 59, no. 27, July 1986, pages 36,38, New York, US; W.R. IVERSEN: "MIT ICE detector taxis for takeoff" |