EP0256825 - Structures of plastics material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House, 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1 3JL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House, 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | ||
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greig, Martyn John 24 Chevington Grove Whitley Bay Tyne & Wear NE24 9UG / GB | 02 /
Bowman, Jeremy Archibald 62 Leas Drive Iver, Buckinghamshire SLO 9RD / GB | [1988/41] |
Former [1988/08] | 01 /
Greig, Martyn John 24 Chevington Grove Whitley Bay Tyne & Wear NE24 9UG / GB | Representative(s) | Cummings, Robert James British Gas plc., Intellectual Property Department, 59 Bryanston Street London W1A 2AZ / GB | [1988/08] | Application number, filing date | 87307064.3 | 10.08.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | GB19860020071 | 18.08.1986 Original published format: GB 8620071 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0256825 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0256825 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256825 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C71/04, B29C65/02, B29D23/22, // B29L31:24 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
B29D23/003 (EP,US);
B29C66/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/032 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/52241 (EP,US);
B29C66/52298 (EP,US);
B29C66/73121 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C71/04 (EP,US);
B29C35/02 (EP,US);
B29C41/04 (EP,US);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/7394 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2105/24 (EP,US);
B29K2105/243 (EP,US);
B29L2031/246 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | Kunststoffstrukturen | [1988/08] | English: | Structures of plastics material | [1988/08] | French: | Structures en matière plastique | [1988/08] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0246030 [ ] (VICTAULIC PLC [GB], et al); | US4056421 [ ] (JARVIS HAROLD F); | US3989787 [ ] (SCOTT JR JOHN N, et al); | DD236236 [ ] (RATIONALISIERUNG KONFEKT VEB [DD]); | US4401536 [ ] (LUNDELL EDWIN O [US], et al); | DE1130153 [ ] (NEOSID PEMETZRIEDER GMBH); | FR2196888 [ ] (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]); | FR2393664 [ ] (HEPWORTH IRON CO LTD [GB]); | FR2463787 [ ] (FREUDENBERG CARL [DE]) | Examination | DD152236 |