EP0262785 - N-[2-(4-carboxymethoxyphenyl)-1-methylethyl]-2-hydroxy-2-(3-chlorophenyl)ethane amine, the methyl ester, salt and stereoisomeric forms thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ainsworth, Anthony Trevor Beecham Pharmaceuticals Coldharbour Road The Pinnacles Harlow Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 02 /
Smith, David Glynn Beecham Pharm. Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | 03 /
Arch Jonathan Robert Sanders Beecham Pharm. Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Russell, Brian John, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Russell, Brian John, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87307446.2 | 24.08.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | GB19860020951 | 29.08.1986 Original published format: GB 8620951 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0262785 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262785 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/54, A61K31/135 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/14] | C07C93/14, A61K31/135 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | N-[2-(4-Carboxymethoxyphenyl)-1-methylethyl]-2-hydroxy-2-(3-chlorophenyl)-ethanamine, ihre Methylester, Salze oder Stereoisomere | [1988/14] | English: | N-[2-(4-carboxymethoxyphenyl)-1-methylethyl]-2-hydroxy-2-(3-chlorophenyl)ethane amine, the methyl ester, salt and stereoisomeric forms thereof | [1988/14] | French: | N-[2-(4-carboxyméthoxyphényl)-1-méthyléthyl]-2-hydroxy-2-(3-chlorophényl)-éthanamine, son ester méthylique, ses sels et formes stéréoisomères | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 01.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Request for further processing for: | 14.08.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0070134 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [Y]EP0170121 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [YD]EP0023385 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) |