EP0263596 - Caster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APRICA KASSAI KABUSHIKIKAISHA 16-1 Higashishimizu-machi, Minami-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states APRICA KASSAI KABUSHIKIKAISHA 16-1 Higashishimizu-machi, Minami-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kassai, Kenzou 16-1 Higashishimizu-machi Minami-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87307895.0 | 07.09.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | JP19860237620 | 06.10.1986 Original published format: JP 23762086 | JP19860176343 | 17.11.1986 Original published format: JP 17634386 | [1988/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0263596 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0263596 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/02 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
B60B33/02 (EP,US);
B62B9/00 (KR);
B60B33/00 (KR);
B62B7/14 (KR);
B62B2301/0463 (EP,US);
B62B2301/0465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/15] | Title | German: | Lenkrolle | [1988/15] | English: | Caster | [1988/15] | French: | Roue à pivot | [1988/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/08] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB971199 (FLEXELLO CASTORS & WHEELS LTD); | [A]EP0023432 (FISHER NORMAN ANTHONY); | [A]FR2489215 (COMAPRIC SA [FR]); | [X]GB2150826 (KASSAI KK); | [A]DE3532594 (PEREGO PINES GMBH [DE]) |