EP0261841 - Improved fire barrier fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.11.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPRINGS INDUSTRIES INC. 205, North White Street Fort Mill South Carolina 29715 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states SPRINGS INDUSTRIES INC. 205, North White Street Fort Mill South Carolina 29715 / US | ||
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states United Merchants and Manufacturers, Inc. 1407 Broadway New York, N.Y. 10018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bafford Richard A. 1027 Brookhaven Drive Aiken South Carolina 29801 / US | 02 /
Hoernle, Hans R. 957 Heard Avenue Augusta Georgia 30906 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1988/13] | 01 /
Bafford Richard A. 1027 Brookhaven Drive Aiken South Carolina 29801 / US | ||
02 /
Hoernle, Hans R. 957 Heard Avenue Augusta Georgia 30906 / US | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308021.2 | 10.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | US19860912264 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: US 912264 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261841 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261841 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/00, B60N1/00, A47C7/26, A41D31/00, A62B17/00, B32B5/26 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
A47C31/001 (EP,KR,US);
A62B17/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/26 (KR,US);
B32B5/024 (KR,US);
B32B2255/02 (KR,US);
B32B2262/0223 (US);
B32B2262/0238 (KR,US);
B32B2262/0292 (KR,US);
B32B2262/101 (KR,US);
B32B2307/3065 (KR,US);
Y10S297/05 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S428/92 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24033 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3504 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/13] | Title | German: | Feuersperrstoff | [1988/13] | English: | Improved fire barrier fabrics | [1988/13] | French: | Tissus formant obstacle au feu | [1988/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/52] | 21.07.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2830925 (FENNEBRESQUE JOHN D, et al); | [A]US4282383 (DAI SHENG-HONG A, et al); | [YP]EP0201204 (UNITED MERCHANTS & MFG [US]) |