EP0262826 - Hygroscopic composite material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/14] | hygroscopic composite material | ||
[1991/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKEN CORPORATION 1-1 Inami, Inami-machi Higashi-tonami-gun Toyama Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states DAIKEN CORPORATION 1-1 Inami, Inami-machi Higashi-tonami-gun Toyama Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimi, Satoshi Daiken Trade & Ind. Co. Ltd. Shin-asahi Bldg. 3-18 Nakanoshima 2-ch. Kita-ku Osaka 530 / JP | 02 /
Matsuoka, Akira Daiken Trade & Ind. Co. Ltd,Shin-asahi Bldg 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-ch., Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP | 03 /
Asano, Kazuhiko Daiken Trade & Ind. Co. Ltd, Shin-asahi Bldg 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-ch., Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308053.5 | 11.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | JP19860216772 | 12.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21677286 | JP19860216773 | 12.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21677386 | JP19860216774 | 12.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21677486 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262826 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262826 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262826 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/52, E04C2/26 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
E04C2/26 (EP,US);
E04C2/528 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249956 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249978 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249981 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | Hygroskopisches Verbundmaterial | [1988/14] | English: | Hygroscopic composite material | [1991/12] | French: | Matériau composite hygroscopique | [1988/14] |
Former [1988/14] | hygroscopic composite material | Examination procedure | 05.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.03.1991 | BE | 20.03.1991 | CH | 20.03.1991 | GR | 20.03.1991 | LI | 20.03.1991 | NL | 20.03.1991 | SE | 20.03.1991 | ES | 01.07.1991 | LU | 30.09.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 20.03.1991 | |
BE | 20.03.1991 | ||
CH | 20.03.1991 | ||
GR | 20.03.1991 | ||
LI | 20.03.1991 | ||
NL | 20.03.1991 | ||
SE | 20.03.1991 | ||
LU | 30.09.1991 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 20.03.1991 | |
BE | 20.03.1991 | ||
CH | 20.03.1991 | ||
LI | 20.03.1991 | ||
NL | 20.03.1991 | ||
SE | 20.03.1991 | ||
LU | 30.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/10] | AT | 20.03.1991 | |
BE | 20.03.1991 | ||
CH | 20.03.1991 | ||
LI | 20.03.1991 | ||
NL | 20.03.1991 | ||
SE | 20.03.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 20.03.1991 | |
CH | 20.03.1991 | ||
LI | 20.03.1991 | ||
NL | 20.03.1991 | ||
SE | 20.03.1991 | ||
Former [1992/01] | CH | 20.03.1991 | |
LI | 20.03.1991 | ||
NL | 20.03.1991 | ||
SE | 20.03.1991 | ||
Former [1991/49] | NL | 20.03.1991 | |
SE | 20.03.1991 | ||
Former [1991/43] | SE | 20.03.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE810186 (PFENNIG ERICH); | [A]GB1200783 (FAVRE & CIE A G [CH]); | [A]US3538660 (MOOR KARL) |