EP0260910 - 3,6-Diphenylpyridazines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0055 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Shinichi 10-1, Otsutomocho Kanazawaku Yokohamashi Kanagawaken / JP | 02 /
Inukai, Takashi 4-46, Mori 3-chome Isogoku Yokohamashi Kanagawaken / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Hiromichi 10-2, Otsutomocho Kanazawaku Yokohamashi Kanagawaken / JP | 04 /
Miyazawa, Kazutoshi 12-14, Mutsuura 2-chome Kanazawaku Yokohamashi Kanagawaken / JP | 05 /
Ohno, Kouji 10-3, Otsutomocho Kanazawaku Yokohamashi Kanagawaken / JP | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308098.0 | 14.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | JP19860217388 | 16.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21738886 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260910 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260910 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/08, C09K19/34 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
C09K19/3455 (EP,US);
C07D237/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1988/12] | Title | German: | 3-6-Diphenylpyridazine | [1988/12] | English: | 3,6-Diphenylpyridazines | [1988/12] | French: | Diphényl-3,6 pyridazines | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0160416 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) | [Y] - ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR CHEMIE, vol. 26, no. 1, 1986, pages 21-23, Verlag Grundstoffind., Leipzig, DD; H. SACKMANN: "Synthese und kristallin-flüssige Eigenschaften einiger 3,6-disubstituierter Pyridazine" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 1, 7th July 1980, page 746, abstract no. 8115g, Columbus, Ohio, US; N. LATIF et al.: "3-Chloro- and 3-arylamino-6-p-isopropylphenyl pyridazines for pesticide research", & EGYPT. J. CHEM. 1977 (Pub. 1979). 20(2),217-23 |