EP0261987 - Method for removing malodorous or toxic gases from an air stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLARCHEM ENTERPRISES INC. 40 West Wilmot Street, Unit 5 Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1H8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states SOLARCHEM ENTERPRISES INC. 40 West Wilmot Street, Unit 5 Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1H8 / CA | ||
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states SOLARCHEM RESEARCH, A DIVISION OF BROLOR INVESTMENTS LIMITED 516 Gordon Baker Road Willowdale Ontario M2H 3B4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stevens, R.D. Samuel 82 Charnwood Place Thornhill Ontario L3T 5H3 / CA | 02 /
Brown, Pauline Macura 201 Donlea Drive Toronto Ontario M4G 2N1 / CA | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/13] | Application number, filing date | 87308526.0 | 25.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | US19860912016 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: US 912016 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261987 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261987 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, A61L9/20 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/72 (EP,US);
B01J19/123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/13] | B01D53/34 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von übelriechenden oder giftigen Gasen aus einem Luftstrom | [1988/13] | English: | Method for removing malodorous or toxic gases from an air stream | [1988/13] | French: | Procédé pour éliminer des gaz méphitiques ou toxiques d'un courant d'air | [1988/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 14.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/09] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57130531 ; | [A]JP55109431 ; | [A]US4045316 (LEGAN ROBERT W); | [A]DE1542358 (OZON VERWERTUNGS AG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 227 (C-134)[1105], 12th November 1982; & JP-A-57 130 531 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 13-08-1982, & JP57130531 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 166 (C-31)[648], 18th November 1980; & JP-A-55 109 431 (EIICHIROU SHIMADA) 22-08-1980, & JP55109431 A 00000000 |