EP0284684 - Inverted channel substrate planar semiconductor laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Jane Jan-Jan 728 S. Bristol Avenue Los Angeles California 90049 / US | 02 /
Hong, Chi-Shain 14145 N.E. 32nd Place Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308536.9 | 28.09.1987 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | US19870033304 | 02.04.1987 Original published format: US 33304 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0284684 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0284684 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284684 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/19 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
H01S5/2231 (EP,US);
H01S5/32316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/40] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser mit umgekehrtem Kanal und ebenem Substrat | [1988/40] | English: | Inverted channel substrate planar semiconductor laser | [1988/40] | French: | Laser à semi-conducteur avec canal inverse et substrat plan | [1988/40] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.07.1992 | [2015/21] |
Former [1993/15] | DE | 29.07.1992 | |
NL | 29.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61029183 ; | [A]JP61224387 ; | [A]JP53110488 ; | [X]US4366568 (SHIMIZU HIROKAZU, et al) | [X] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 58, no. 11, 1st December 1985, pages 4480-4482, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; J.J. YANG et al.: "High-power single longitudinal mode operation of inverted channel substrate planar lasers" | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 179 (E-414)[2235], 24th June 1986; & JP-A-61 029 183 (AGENCY OF IND. SCIENCE & TECHNOL.) 10-02-1986, & JP61029183 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 65 (E-484)[2512], 27th February 1987; & JP-A-61 224 387 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO) 06-10-1986, & JP61224387 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 143 (E-74), 25th November 1978, page 8986 E 78; & JP-A-53 110 488 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 27-09-1978, & JP53110488 A 00000000 |