EP0262948 - Process for producing omega-hydroxy fatty acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON MINING COMPANY LIMITED 12-32, Akasaka 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokota, Tadafumi c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Okino, Hiroshi c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
Takagi, Motoyoshi c/o Nippon Mining Co., Ltd. 17-35 Niizominami 3-chome Toda-shi Saitama / JP | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308659.9 | 30.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | JP19860231253 | 01.10.1986 Original published format: JP 23125386 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262948 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262948 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262948 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/01, C07C51/367 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
C07C51/367 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/367, C07C59/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Omega-Hydroxyfettsäuren | [1988/14] | English: | Process for producing omega-hydroxy fatty acids | [1988/14] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'acides gras omega-hydroxyliques | [1988/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2066533 ; | [A]GB316158 | [XD] - ORGANIC SYNTHESES COLLECTIVE, vol. 4, 1963, pages 635-638; L.J. DURHAM et al.: "Methyl hydrogen hendecanedioate" |