EP0263655 - Novel peptides having antiallergic activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.05.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 25, Doshomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | For all designated states AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 5-8, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states Dainippon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 25, Doshomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 5-8, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Hideo 449-65, Oji-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Katsumi 12-1-308, Kojogaoka Otsu-shi Siga-ken / JP | 03 /
Ariyoshi, Yasuo 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Nio, Noriki 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308776.1 | 02.10.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | JP19860236658 | 03.10.1986 Original published format: JP 23665886 | [1988/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0263655 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0263655 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/00, A61K37/02 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/70535 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K16/065 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/15] | Title | German: | Peptide mit antiallergischer Wirksamkeit | [1988/15] | English: | Novel peptides having antiallergic activity | [1988/15] | French: | Peptides à activité antiallergique | [1988/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/28] | 27.02.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4161522 (HAMBURGER ROBERT N [US]); | [AP]US4683292 (HAHN GARY S [US]) | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNTITED STATES OF AMERICA, vol. 79, no. 24, December 1982, pages 7852-7856; F.-T. LIU et al.: "Cloning and nucleotide sequence of mouse immunoglobulin epsilon chain cDNA" | [YD] - NATURE, vol. 315, 13th June 1985 page 577, London, GB; R.S. GEHA et al.: "Inhibition of the Prausnitz-K}stner reaction by an immunoglobulin epsilon-chain fragment synthesized in E. coli" | [YP] - JOURNAL OF CLINICAL LABORATORY ANALYSIS, vol. 1, no. 3, March 1987, pages 251-261, Alan R. Liss, Inc., New York, US; H.L. Spiegelberg et al.: "Primary and secondary immune response to human IgE by rabbits immunized with synthetic IgE peptides" |