EP0266903 - Board treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1991 [1991/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DERITEND ENGINEERING LIMITED Spring Road Hall Green Birmingham B11 3DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states DERITEND ENGINEERING LIMITED Spring Road Hall Green Birmingham B11 3DR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Leonard 8 Arden Road Hollywood Wythall West Midlands / GB | 02 /
Moulds, Christopher Charles 30 Digby Drive Marston Green Birmingham B37 7DU / GB | 03 /
Richards, Martin William Langdon 100 Needlers End Lane Balsall Common Near Coventry CV7 7AB / GB | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al LEWIS W. GOOLD & CO. Whitehall Chambers 23, Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308788.6 | 05.10.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | GB19860026179 | 01.11.1986 Original published format: GB 8626179 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266903 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266903 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B26F3/02 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
B26F3/002 (EP);
B65H35/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/19] | Title | German: | Kartonbehandlungsvorrichtung | [1988/19] | English: | Board treatment apparatus | [1988/19] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de carton | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 14.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1231100 [ ]; | DE2445703 [ ]; | GB1333161 [ ]; | US4498894 [ ] | Examination | GB1008152 |