EP0264217 - Aralkylaminopyrimidine derivative, process for producing thereof and insecticide, acaricide and fungicide containing said derivative as active ingredient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP | ||
For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshioka, Hirosuke The Institute of Physical & Chemical Research 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Obata, Tokio Ube Research Lab., Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Katsutoshi Ube Research Lab., Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 04 /
Tsutsumiuchi, Kiyoshi Ube Research Lab., Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 05 /
Yoshiya, Haruo Ube Research Lab., Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-5 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1993/26] |
Former [1988/16] | 01 /
Yoshioka, Hirosuke The Inst. of Physical Chemical Research 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Obata, Tokio UBE Research Laboratory Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Fujii, Katsutoshi UBE Research Laboratory Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Tsutsumiuchi, Kiyoshi UBE Research Laboratory Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Yoshiya, Haruo UBE Research Laboratory Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1988/16] | Burnside, Michael Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308818.1 | 06.10.1987 | [1988/16] | Priority number, date | JP19860237878 | 08.10.1986 Original published format: JP 23787886 | JP19870108899 | 06.05.1987 Original published format: JP 10889987 | JP19870225180 | 10.09.1987 Original published format: JP 22518087 | [1988/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264217 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264217 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264217 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42, C07D239/46, C07D401/12, A01N43/54, C07D403/12, C07D405/12 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/58 (EP,US);
A01N43/66 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N49/00 (EP,US);
A01N55/00 (EP,US);
C07D239/56 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/16] | C07D239/42, C07D239/46, C07D401/12, A01N43/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/16] | Title | German: | Arylaminopyrimidin-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese als wirksamen Stoff enthaltende Insektizide, Akarizide und Fungizide | [1988/16] | English: | Aralkylaminopyrimidine derivative, process for producing thereof and insecticide, acaricide and fungicide containing said derivative as active ingredient | [1988/16] | French: | Dérivés d'aralkylaminopyrimidine, procédé pour leur préparation et insecticides, acaricides et fongicides contenant ces composés comme ingredients actifs | [1988/16] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 11.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP59036666 ; | [A]JP60036403 ; | [X]EP0057440 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 126 (C-228)[1563], 13th Juni 1984; & JP-A-59 036 666 (SANKYO K.K.) 28-02-1984, & JP59036666 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 160 (C-289)[1883], 4th July 1985; & JP-A-60 036 403 (SUMITOMO KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 25-02-1985, & JP60036403 A 00000000 | by applicant | JPS5936666 | - JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY (J.A.C.S, (1958), vol. 80, page 2189 |