EP0265131 - Simplified recovery of data signals from quadrature-related carrier signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1988/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debus, Walter, Jr. Box 208 Nottingham New Hampshire 03290 / US | 02 /
Reeve, Howard Clifford, III 28A Stevens Street Methuen Massachusetts 01844 / US | 03 /
Siller, Curtis Albert, Jr. 3 Wintergreen Circle Andover Massachusetts 01810 / US | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1988/17] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308987.4 | 12.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | US19860920367 | 20.10.1986 Original published format: US 920367 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0265131 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0265131 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0265131 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/34 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
H04L27/363 (EP,US);
H04L27/3881 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/17] | H04L27/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/17] | Title | German: | Vereinfachte Zurückgewinnung von Daten aus Signalen mit Quadraturträgern | [1988/17] | English: | Simplified recovery of data signals from quadrature-related carrier signals | [1988/17] | French: | Récupération simplifiée de données à partir de signaux ayant des porteuses en quadrature | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8603356 (DEVON COUNTY COUNCIL [GB], et al) | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-23, no. 3, March 1975, pages 348-352, IEEE, New York, US; R.D. GITLIN et al.: "The performance of staggered quadrature amplitude modulation in the presence of phase jitter" |