EP0264279 - Foil assembly for water-borne craft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTION DESIGN CREATIONS INC. 123 Pine Avenue P.O.Box 359 Hudson, Quebec J0P 1H0 / CA | [1992/22] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states Stewart, Leo James 123 Pine Avenue P.O. Box 359 Hudson Quebec J0P 1H0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stewart, Leo James 123 Pine Avenue P.O. Box 359 Hudson, Quebec JOP 1HO / CA | [1993/01] |
Former [1988/16] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Stringer, David Hiram, et al GEOFFREY OWEN & COMPANY 76 Lower Bridge Street Chester CH1 1RU / GB | [1988/16] | Application number, filing date | 87309113.6 | 15.10.1987 | [1988/16] | Priority number, date | US19860919220 | 15.10.1986 Original published format: US 919220 | [1988/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0264279 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264279 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/79, B63B41/00 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B63B32/64 (EP,US);
B63B2035/009 (US)
|
Former IPC [1988/16] | B63B35/82, B63B41/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1988/16] | Title | German: | Finne für Wasserfahrzeuge | [1988/16] | English: | Foil assembly for water-borne craft | [1988/16] | French: | Aile pour engin flottant | [1988/16] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 08.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2932750 (MARKER HANNES); | [A]EP0059344 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [A]DE3109307 (SCOPINICH VITTORIO); | [X]BE894306 (HERSTAL SA); | [A]US4493665 (LIDDLE EDWARD M [US]); | [A]DE3343579 (PETER BROCKHAUS MARKETING GMBH [DE]) |