EP0265223 - Surface modified pigments and methods for producing same and elastomers containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.C.C. AMERICA INC. 5775 Peachtree-Dunwoody Road N.E. Suite 200 G Atlanta Georgia 30342 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states E.C.C. AMERICA INC. 5775 Peachtree-Dunwoody Road N.E. Suite 200 G Atlanta Georgia 30342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prescott, Paul I. 150 Rockbridge Road Lilburn, Georgia 30247 / US | 02 /
Rice, Camilla Arlyn 634 W. Church Street Sandersville Georgia 31082 / US | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Bull, Michael Alan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Bull, Michael Alan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309248.0 | 20.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | US19860921141 | 20.10.1986 Original published format: US 921141 | US19870099316 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: US 99316 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0265223 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0265223 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/42, C08K9/06, C08L21/00 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,US);
C09C1/42 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/06, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Oberflächenmodifizierte Pigmente, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und solche enthaltende Elastomere | [1988/17] | English: | Surface modified pigments and methods for producing same and elastomers containing same | [1988/17] | French: | Pigments modifiés en surface, procédé de préparation et élastomères contenant les pigments | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.1990 | BE | 31.01.1990 | CH | 31.01.1990 | GR | 31.01.1990 | LI | 31.01.1990 | LU | 31.10.1990 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 31.01.1990 | |
BE | 31.01.1990 | ||
CH | 31.01.1990 | ||
LI | 31.01.1990 | ||
LU | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | AT | 31.01.1990 | |
BE | 31.01.1990 | ||
CH | 31.01.1990 | ||
LI | 31.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 31.01.1990 | |
CH | 31.01.1990 | ||
LI | 31.01.1990 | ||
Former [1990/45] | CH | 31.01.1990 | |
LI | 31.01.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]ES482033 ; | [A]FR2007761 (HUBER CORP J M); | [A]EP0126871 (DEGUSSA [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, VOL. 94, NO. 4, 26TH JANUARY 1981, PAGE 59, ABSTRACT NO. 16901W, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; & ES-A1-482 033 (TOLSA S.A.) 01-04-1980, & ES482033 A1 00000000 |