EP0266128 - Production of hexavalent chromium for use in chlorate cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenneco Canada Inc. 2 Gibbs Road Islington Ontario M9B 1R1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states Tenneco Canada Inc. 2 Gibbs Road Islington Ontario M9B 1R1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobosz, Leszek Michal 68 MacDonald Street Toronto Ontario M8V 1Y4 / CA | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Hamilton, Raymond, et al c/o Albright & Wilson Limited, P.O. Box 2098, 7 Stars Road Oldbury, Warley West Midlands B69 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Hamilton, Raymond, et al c/o Albright & Wilson Limited, P.O. Box 2098, 7 Stars Road Oldbury, Warley, West Midlands B69 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309335.5 | 22.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | CA19860521737 | 29.10.1986 Original published format: CA 521737 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266128 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266128 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/26, C25B15/08, C01G37/14 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
C01G37/00 (EP,US);
C01G37/033 (EP,US);
C01G37/04 (EP,US);
C01G37/14 (EP,US);
C25B1/265 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/18] | C25B1/26 | Designated contracting states | CH, ES, FR, LI, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Erzeugung von sechswertigem Chrom zur Anwendung in Chloratelektrolysezellen | [1988/18] | English: | Production of hexavalent chromium for use in chlorate cells | [1988/18] | French: | Production de chrome hexavalant à utiliser dans des cellules de production électrolytique de chlorate | [1988/18] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 05.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0025334 (OLIN CORP [US]); | [X]DE3032131 (CHEMETICS INT); | [X]DE3032139 (CHEMETICS INT); | [A]US4376099 (YAMAMOTO HIDEO [JP], et al) |