EP0265265 - Heat-recoverable fabric article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYCHEM LIMITED Rolls House 7, Rolls Buildings Fetter Lane London, EC4 1NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states RAYCHEM LIMITED Rolls House 7, Rolls Buildings Fetter Lane London, EC4 1NL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hutt, Norman 2 Elmore Eldene Swindon Wiltshire SN3 3TL / GB | 02 /
Winfield, Philip Roland Churchfield House Latton Nr Swindon Wiltshire SN6 6DS / GB | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Benson, John Everett, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309353.8 | 22.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | GB19860025369 | 23.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8625369 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0265265 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0265265 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0265265 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C61/06 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
B29C61/0658 (EP,US);
B29C61/0633 (EP,US);
Y10S174/08 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1033 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1328 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2809 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2835 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Artikel aus wärmeschrumpfbarem Gewebe | [1988/17] | English: | Heat-recoverable fabric article | [1988/17] | French: | Article en tissu thermorétractable | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1088572 (RAYCHEM CORP); | [AD]US3669157 (WOODALL HUBERT C JR, et al); | [A]GB2103992 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0117026 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB]); | [YD]GB2168648 (RAYCHEM CORP [GB]) |