EP0266145 - Electronic data processing apparatus for improved algebraic expression manipulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/18] | Improved algebraic expression manipulation method and implementation for an electronic data processing apparatus | ||
[1994/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patton, Charles M. 1120 Fir Acres Drive Eugene Oregon 97401 / US | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309419.7 | 26.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | US19860923921 | 27.10.1986 Original published format: US 923921 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266145 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266145 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266145 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F15/02 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
G06F15/02 (EP,US);
G06F9/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/18] | G06F15/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/18] | Title | German: | Elektronische Datenverarbeitungsanlage zur Manipulation von algebraischen Formeln | [1994/15] | English: | Electronic data processing apparatus for improved algebraic expression manipulation | [1994/15] | French: | Installation de traitement électronique de données pour la manipulation de formule algébrique | [1994/15] |
Former [1988/18] | Verfahren zur Manipulation von algebraischen Formeln und dessen Ausführung für eine elektronische Datenverarbeitungsanlage | ||
Former [1988/18] | Improved algebraic expression manipulation method and implementation for an electronic data processing apparatus | ||
Former [1988/18] | Méthode de manipulation de formule algébrique et sa mise en oeuvre pour une installation de traitement électronique de données | Examination procedure | 19.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3508548 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [A] - The 11th Annual International Symposium on Computer Architecture, June 5-7 1984, Ann Arbor, MICH, USA; D. UNGAR et al. "Architecture of SOAR: Smalltalk on a RISC" P. 188-197 | [A] - Proceedings of the 1986 IEEE International Conference on Systems, Man and Cybernetics, Oct 14-17, 1986, Atlanta, Georgia, USA R.J.K. JACOB "Direct Manipulation" p. 384-388 | [XP] - Hewlett-Packard Journal, Vol. 38, Aug. 1987, No. 8, W.C. WICKES "An Evolutionary RPN Calculator for Technical Professionals", P. 11-17 | [A] - Microprocessing and Microprogramming, Vol. 13, Apr. 1984, No. 4 F MAYER-LINDENBERG "An Interactive Programming Environment for Personal Microsystems Supporting Distributed Processing" p. 255-266 | Examination | - Brown, P.J.: "Writing interactive compilers and interpreters" John Wiley & Sons, 1984 |