EP0266174 - Tape recording and reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/18] | Tape recording and/or reproducing apparatus | ||
[1993/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Yuji c/o Patent DivisionSony Cor. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/18] | Application number, filing date | 87309492.4 | 27.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | JP19860254968 | 27.10.1986 Original published format: JP 25496886 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266174 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266174 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266174 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/30, G11B20/10 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (KR);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1208 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10546 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, LI, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Bandaufzeichnung und Wiedergabe | [1993/33] | English: | Tape recording and reproducing apparatus | [1993/33] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction sur bande | [1993/33] |
Former [1988/18] | Gerät zur Bandaufzeichnung und/oder -Wiedergabe | ||
Former [1988/18] | Tape recording and/or reproducing apparatus | ||
Former [1988/18] | Appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de reproduction sur bande | Examination procedure | 25.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP56051070 ; | [AP]JP61133062 ; | [AD]EP0196104 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 107 (P-70)(779), 11 July 1981; & JP-A-56 051 070 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 08.05.1981, & JP56051070 A 19810711 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 327 (P-513)(2383), 7 November 1986; & JP-A-61 133 062 (HITACHI LTD.) 20.06.1986, & JP61133062 A 19861107 |