EP0276545 - Quick connect cable coupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 S. Limerick Road Limerick Pennsylvania 19468 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 S. Limerick Road Limerick Pennsylvania 19468 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersen, Carl O. 200 Rogers Road Norristown Pennsylvania 19403 / US | 02 /
Irvin, John E. 71 Level Road Collegeville Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 03 /
Rhodenbaugh, Gary W. 142 Walnut Street Mont Clare Pennsylvania 19453 / US | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309654.9 | 30.10.1987 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | US19870006789 | 27.01.1987 Original published format: US 6789 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276545 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276545 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/26 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
F16C1/262 (EP,US);
Y10T403/535 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | Schnellverbinder für Bowdenzug | [1988/31] | English: | Quick connect cable coupler | [1988/31] | French: | Connexion rapide pour câble de commande | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/04] | 29.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1471288 (MECANIQUE IND INT); | [YD]US3766801 (WIEGAND H); | [YD]US4275907 (HUNT ALEXANDER C); | [AD]US4440425 (PATE HAROLD T [US], et al); | [AD]US4238974 (FAWCETT HARRY E [US]); | [A]DE3209040 (CHUO HATSUJO KK [JP]); | [A]DE2314598 (BRITISH WIRE PRODUCTS LTD); | [A]FR2381937 (DBA [FR]); | [A]US3063303 (CADWALLADER ALVIN A) |