EP0271206 - Vehicle winch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELLWAY (SERVICES) LIMITED Horsley House Regent Centre Gosforth Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 3LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states BELLWAY (SERVICES) LIMITED Horsley House Regent Centre Gosforth Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 3LU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Dietrich Adolf Half Moon House Kirkwhelpington Northumberland / GB | 02 /
O'Connell, Geoffrey William The Croft Belford Northumberland / GB | 03 /
Norman, Michael Eric The Glebe Farmhouse Prudhoe Northumberland / GB | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Evans, David Charles, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Evans, David Charles, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309802.4 | 05.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | GB19860027684 | 19.11.1986 Original published format: GB 8627684 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271206 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271206 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B66D3/20, B66D1/38 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
B66D1/38 (EP,US);
B66D3/00 (KR);
B60D1/38 (EP,US);
B66D1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugwinde | [1988/24] | English: | Vehicle winch | [1988/24] | French: | Treuil de véhicule | [1988/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE438528 (HOFFMANN ALEXANDER); | [Y]GB2048201 (CARRUTHERS & CO J H); | [Y]EP0136017 (STEEL JAMES); | [A]DE3442138 (RHEIN GETRIEBE GMBH [DE]) |