EP0267761 - Preparation process of 4,4'-dihydroxybiphenyl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konai, Yutaka 1-1, Eguri-Omachi Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken 974 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Takashi 1-180-1, Onuma-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187 / JP | 03 /
Tanonaka, Takayuki 55-1, Sekishita Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken 974 / JP | 04 /
Toshida, Kazuo 16-1, Maehara Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken 974 / JP | 05 /
Machida, Yoshihisa 55-1, Sekishita Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken 974 / JP | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1988/20] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309871.9 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/20] | Priority number, date | JP19860263841 | 07.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26384186 | [1988/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0267761 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0267761 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0267761 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/50, C07C39/15 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
C07C37/50 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/50, C07C39/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 4,4'-Dihydroxybiphenyl | [1988/20] | English: | Preparation process of 4,4'-dihydroxybiphenyl | [1988/20] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de 4,4'-dihydroxybiphényl | [1988/20] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 07.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS532430 ; | [A]JPS532435 ; | [APD]GB2176188 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780328), vol. 002, no. 046, Database accession no. (C - 77)<5163> , & JP53002430 A 19780111 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780328), vol. 002, no. 046, Database accession no. (C - 77)<5165> , & JP53002435 A 19780111 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) | [A] - BELEN'KII M.S. ET AL, "Preparation of aliphatic-aromatic hydroperoxides by the oxidation of dimethylcarbinol and alpha, alpha'-dihydroxy-diisopropylbenzenes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19720619), vol. 76, no. 25, Database accession no. 153277Q, page 423, column 1 | [ ] - KHIM. PROM., (1972), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 24 - 26 |