EP0269306 - Low-frequency treatment device directed to use in a bath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayashibara, Ken 9-8, 4-chome, Higashi-Furumatsu Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states Hayashibara, Ken 9-8, 4-chome, Higashi-Furumatsu Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masaki, Kazumi 7-3, 4-chome, Fujishirodai Suita-shi Osaka / JP | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1988/22] | Application number, filing date | 87309921.2 | 10.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | JP19860268304 | 11.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26830486 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269306 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/44, A61N1/32 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
A61N1/445 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (KR);
A61N1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/22] | Title | German: | Niederfrequenz-Behandlungsvorrichtung zum Gebrauch in einem Bad | [1988/22] | English: | Low-frequency treatment device directed to use in a bath | [1988/22] | French: | Dispositif de traitement basse fréquence utilisable dans un bain | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 24.10.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1390732 [ ] (NEURO SYSTEMS INC); | US3902502 [ ] (LISS SAUL, et al); | DE3300947 [ ] (HAYASHIBARA KEN [JP]); | DE851992 [ ] (SCHLEVOGT ERNST DR MED); | DE2942938 [ ] (NEMEC HANS) |