EP0267795 - Murine-interleukin-2 muteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Biotech Corporation 901 California Avenue Palo Alto California 94304-1104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states Schering Biotech Corporation 901 California Avenue Palo Alto California 94304-1104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zurawski, Gerard 1028 Wilmington Way Redwood City California 94062 / US | 02 /
Zurawski, Sandra M. 1028 Wilmington Way Redwood City California 94062 / US | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310005.1 | 12.11.1987 | [1988/20] | Priority number, date | US19860930768 | 14.11.1986 Original published format: US 930768 | [1988/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0267795 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0267795 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K13/00, // C12N15/00, C12P21/02, A61K37/02 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP);
C07K14/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/20] | Title | German: | Muteine des Maus-Interleukin-2 | [1988/20] | English: | Murine-interleukin-2 muteins | [1988/20] | French: | Mutéines de l'interleukine-2 de la souris | [1988/20] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.02.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0177357 [ ] |