EP0271229 - Cutting webs of material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRG (UK) LIMITED 1 Redcliffe Street Bristol Avon, BS99 7QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states DRG (UK) LIMITED 1 Redcliffe Street Bristol Avon, BS99 7QY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bowman, Kenneth Albert 11 Kelston Grove Hanham Bristol, BS15 3RJ / GB | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1988/24] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310046.5 | 13.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | GB19860027184 | 13.11.1986 Original published format: GB 8627184 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0271229 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
B23D35/008 (EP);
B65H45/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Schneidvorrichtung für Bänder | [1988/24] | English: | Cutting webs of material | [1988/24] | French: | Dispositif pour couper des bandes | [1988/24] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4328727 ; | [X]DE2522654 ; | [X]EP0175111 ; | [X]DE8422845U |