EP0269336 - Semiconductor integrated circuit packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1988/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moyer, Harold William 1602 Ruth Street Allentown Pennsylvania 18104 / US | 02 /
Scholz, Harry Robert 1385 Oak Drive Macungie Pennsylvania 18062 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1988/22] | 01 /
Moyer, Harold William 1602 Ruth Street Allentown Pennsylvania 18104 / US | ||
02 /
Scholz, Harry Robert 1385 Oak Drive Macungie Pennsylvania 18062 / US | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1988/22] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310085.3 | 16.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | US19860934062 | 24.11.1986 Original published format: US 934062 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269336 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269336 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/50, H01L23/12, H01L23/48 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
H01L23/49544 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1988/22] | H01L23/12, H01L23/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/22] | Title | German: | Gehäuse von integrierten Halbleiterschaltkreisen | [1988/22] | English: | Semiconductor integrated circuit packages | [1988/22] | French: | Boîtiers de circuits intégrés à semi-conducteur | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1998/31] | 23.04.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/31] | Appeal following examination | 10.11.1994 | Appeal received No. T0095/95 | 13.01.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.03.1997 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1997/12] | 17.07.1997 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1997/29] | 23.04.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 23.04.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57118658 ; | [Y]JP61063047 ; | [Y]JP57066655 ; | [Y]EP0053966 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]DD240984 (ERFURT MIKROELEKTRONIK [DD]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN. vol. 6, no. 215 (E-138)(1093) 28 October 1982; & JP-A-57 118 658 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 23-07-1982, & JP57118658 A 19821028 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN. vol. 10, no. 228 (E-426)(2284) 8 August 1986; & JP-A-61 063 047 (HITACHI LTD.) 01-04-1986, & JP61063047 A 19860808 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN. vol. 6, no. 144 (E-122)(1022) 3 August 1982; & JP-A-57 066 655 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 22-04-1982, & JP57066655 A 19820803 |