EP0274204 - Pumping apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harris, Kenneth Maxwell 15 Court Drive Queens Road Maidstone Kent ME16 0JJ / GB | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Thompson, George Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [1988/28] | Application number, filing date | 87310260.2 | 20.11.1987 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | GB19860028872 | 03.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8628872 | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274204 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274204 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F02M41/06, F02M59/44, F02M59/36 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
F02M41/06 (EP);
F02M59/366 (EP);
F02M59/38 (EP);
F02M59/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/28] | Title | German: | Einspritzpumpe | [1988/28] | English: | Pumping apparatus | [1988/28] | French: | Appareil de pompage | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 30.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4347818 ; | [AD]GB2153017 |