EP0272008 - Modular circuit board bussing connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) 470 Friendship Road P.O. Box 3608 Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilissen, Hermanus P. J. 7A Haarenseweg Esch / NL | 02 /
Soes, Lucas Lijsterbeslaan 36 Rosmalen / NL | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1988/25] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310338.6 | 24.11.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | GB19860030450 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8630450 | GB19870021677 | 15.09.1987 Original published format: GB 8721677 | [1988/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0272008 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272008 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/68 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
H01R12/7082 (EP);
H01R13/514 (EP);
H01R29/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01R12/00, H01R13/514, H01R29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/25] | Title | German: | Modularer Verteilungsverbinder für Schaltkarte | [1988/25] | English: | Modular circuit board bussing connector | [1988/25] | French: | Connecteur modulaire de distribution pour cartes à circuits imprimés | [1994/22] |
Former [1988/25] | Connecteur modulaire de distribution pour cartes à circuits imprimès | Examination procedure | 17.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 07.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3924915 (CONRAD RICHARD A); | [A]GB2036464 (INT COMPUTERS LTD); | [AD]US4322120 (RILLING HANS); | [A]EP0081986 (ADVANCED CIRCUIT TECH [US]); | [A]US4401351 (RECORD GRANT C [US]) |