EP0277418 - Photosensitive resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/32] | Conjugated diene copolymer, process for producing the same, and photosensitive resin composition comprising the same | ||
[1992/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD. 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD. 11-24, Tsukiji-2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwanaga, Shin-ichiro 1, Morigayamacho Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 02 /
Matsunaga, Tatsuaki 1, Morigayamacho Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 03 /
Nishiwaki, Ituo 2114-2, Yamanoisshikicho Yokkaichi-shi / JP | 04 /
Enyo, Hiroji 1377-51, Yasuzukacho Suzuka-shi / JP | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Clifford, Frederick Alan, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1988/32] | Application number, filing date | 87310464.0 | 26.11.1987 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | JP19860308133 | 26.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30813386 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277418 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277418 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/00, G03F7/00 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
G03F7/033 (EP,US);
C08F236/04 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/32] | C08F236/04, G03F7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/32] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Harzzusammensetzung | [1992/04] | English: | Photosensitive resin composition | [1992/04] | French: | Composition de résine photosensible | [1992/04] |
Former [1988/32] | Kopolymer eines konjugierten Diens, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung, welche dieses Kopolymer enthält | ||
Former [1988/32] | Conjugated diene copolymer, process for producing the same, and photosensitive resin composition comprising the same | ||
Former [1988/32] | Copolymère d'un diène conjugué, son procédé de préparation et composition photosensible contenant ce copolymère | Examination procedure | 10.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 14.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0162570 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [X]DE2653822 (SUMITOMO NAUGATUCK) | Examination | US4275142 |