EP0270336 - Method and apparatus for tensioning a riser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONOCO INC. 1000 South Pine Street Ponca City Oklahoma 74603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states CONOCO INC. 1000 South Pine Street Ponca City Oklahoma 74603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myers, Roderick J. 523 Ashford Forrest Houston TX 77079 / US | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310555.5 | 30.11.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | US19860936579 | 01.12.1986 Original published format: US 936579 | US19870041904 | 24.04.1987 Original published format: US 41904 | [1988/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0270336 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0270336 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0270336 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/00, E21B33/035, E21B7/128, E21B43/01 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
E21B19/006 (EP,US);
E02B17/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1988/23] | E21B19/00, E21B7/128, E21B43/01, E21B33/035 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1988/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Spannen eines Steigrohres | [1988/23] | English: | Method and apparatus for tensioning a riser | [1988/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mettre sous tension une colonne montante | [1988/23] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 09.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4364323 (STEVENSON WILLIAM D); | [A]US4395160 (DEJONG SIJTZE) |