EP0273627 - Fixed bed process for polymerizing liquid butenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden, New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Frank Joung-yei 28 Ellison Avenue Edison New Jersey / US | 02 /
Lundberg, Robert Dean 4 Brian Drive Bridgewater New Jersey / US | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310949.0 | 11.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | US19860941288 | 12.12.1986 Original published format: US 941288 | US19870093804 | 04.09.1987 Original published format: US 93804 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273627 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273627 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273627 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/08, C08F2/00 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
C08F10/08 (EP);
C08F10/10 (KR);
C08F4/14 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/08, C08F2/00 (EP);
C08F10/08, C08F4/14 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/27] | Title | German: | Festbettverfahren für die Polymerisation von flüssigen Butenen | [1988/27] | English: | Fixed bed process for polymerizing liquid butenes | [1988/27] | French: | Procédé à lit fixe pour la polymérisation de butènes liquides | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 17.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.1988 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   04.02.1988 | 11.01.1988 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   04.02.1988 | 11.01.1988 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   04.02.1988 | 11.01.1988 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   04.02.1988 | 11.01.1988 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   04.02.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB2001662 (COSDEN TECHNOLOGY); | [AD]US2698320 (GARABRANT ARTHUR R, et al); | [AD]US3109041 (CHILD EDWARD T, et al) | Examination | EP0101205 |