EP0272067 - Process and apparatus for upset forging of long stands of metal bar stock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STELCO INC. Stelco Tower, P.O. Box 2030 Hamilton Ontario L8N 3T1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states STELCO INC. Stelco Tower, P.O. Box 2030 Hamilton Ontario L8N 3T1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prenn, Otto E. 1962 Glenmore Avenue Sherwood Park Alberta T8A 2G5 / CA | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310959.9 | 14.12.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | CA19860525761 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: CA 525761 | [1988/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272067 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272067 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21J5/08, B21J9/06, B21J1/06 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
B21K1/76 (EP,US);
B21J1/06 (EP,US);
B21J5/08 (EP,US);
B21J9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stauchschmieden langer Abschnitte von Metallstangen | [1988/25] | English: | Process and apparatus for upset forging of long stands of metal bar stock | [1988/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le forgeage par refoulement des parties longues de barres métalliques | [1988/25] | File destroyed: | 05.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/27] | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.12.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.01.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0044783 (FRANCAIS ACIERS SPECIAUX [FR]); | [X]GB2070481 (DIESEL KIKI CO); | [Y]FR2382288 (SOFOMEC [FR]); | [A]US2507817 (IRWIN ROPP, et al); | [A]US2581774 (STONE HARRY F, et al); | [X]JPS5825837 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no 104, (M-212)[1249], 6th May 1983; & JP-A-58 025 837 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK)16-02-1983 |