EP0275669 - Use of heterocyclic derivatives for the manufacture of medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Clarges House 6-12 Clarges Street London W1Y 8DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tyers, Michael Brian c/o Glaxo Group Research Ltd., Priory Street Ware, Hertfordshire / GB | [1992/40] |
Former [1988/30] | 01 /
Tyers, Michael Brian c/o Glaxo Group Research Limited Priory Street Ware Hertfordshire / GB | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311080.3 | 16.12.1987 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | GB19860030079 | 17.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8630079 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0275669 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275669 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/425, A61K31/415, A61K31/46, A61K31/55, // (A61K31/55, 31:46, 31:425, 31:415) | [1988/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/425 (EP);
A61K31/415 (EP);
A61K31/46 (EP);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/425, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/46, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/30] | Title | German: | Anwendung heterozyklischer Dervate zur Herstellung von Arzneimitteln | [1988/30] | English: | Use of heterocyclic derivatives for the manufacture of medicaments | [1988/30] | French: | Application des dérivés hétérocycliques pour la fabrication de médicaments | [1988/30] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.1992 | BE | 30.09.1992 | GR | 30.09.1992 | NL | 30.09.1992 | SE | 30.09.1992 | LU | 31.12.1992 | ES | 10.01.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 30.09.1992 | |
BE | 30.09.1992 | ||
GR | 30.09.1992 | ||
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
LU | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 30.09.1992 | |
BE | 30.09.1992 | ||
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
LU | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 30.09.1992 | |
BE | 30.09.1992 | ||
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 30.09.1992 | |
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 30.09.1992 | |
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | SE | 30.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2153821 (GLAXO GROUP LTD); | [E]EP0226266 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) | Examination | - BAYS & FINCH, 1990, Natural Product Reports, vol. 7; pp. 409-445. | - MARTINDALE, 1982, 28th ed.; p. 1294. |