EP0272113 - Anti-human cancer monoclonal antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 1-6-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohte-Machi Itchome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Hajime c/o Patent Department Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co. Ltd. 6-1 Ohtemachi Itchome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Furuya, Akiko c/o Patent Department Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co. Ltd. 6-1 Ohtemachi Itchome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/25] | Application number, filing date | 87311102.5 | 16.12.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | JP19860302410 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30241086 | [1988/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272113 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272113 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C07K15/00, G01N33/574, G01N33/577 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/3046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/25] | Title | German: | Monoklonale Antikörper gegen menschlichen Krebs | [1988/25] | English: | Anti-human cancer monoclonal antibodies | [1988/25] | French: | Anticorps monoclonaux contre le cancer humain | [1988/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/17] | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.10.1990 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0119556 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]); | [X]EP0199141 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]); | [X]EP0200464 (HYBRITECH CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0156578 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 5, 4th February 1985, page 417, abstract no. 44040s, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.C. MORGAN, Jr. et al.: "Monoclonal antibodies to human colorectal tumor-associated antigens", & HYBRIDOMA 1984, 3(3)233-45 | [X] - SCIENCE, vol. 212, no. 4490, 3rd April 1981, pages 53-55, The American Association for the Advencement of ScienceUS; H. KOPROWSKI et al.: "Specific antigen in serum of patients with colon carcinoma" | [X] - BIOSCIENCE REPORTS; vol. 3, 1983, pages 163-170, The Biochemical SocietyGB; A. BROWN et al.: "A monoclonal antibody against human colonic adenoma recognizes difucosylated type-2-blood-group chains" |