EP0273661 - Thiolcarboxylic acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Kagaku Kogyo Co., Ltd 1, 5-chome, Koraibashi Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Kagaku Kogyo Co., Ltd 1, 5-chome, Koraibashi Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Tatsuhito 5-9-9, Mikageyamate Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Funae, Yasuaki 4-52, Nakanoshima-cho Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Yosida, Masahiro 4-52, Nakanoshima-cho Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Takaya, Tsuguo 13-29, Ohiro 2-chome Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1988/27] | Application number, filing date | 87311203.1 | 18.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | JP19860308337 | 26.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30833786 | JP19870186572 | 28.07.1987 Original published format: JP 18657287 | JP19870265440 | 22.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26544087 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273661 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273661 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C327/22, C08F120/38 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C08F20/38 (EP,US);
C07C327/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/27] | C07C153/11, C08F120/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/27] | Title | German: | Ester von Thiolcarboxylsäuren | [1988/27] | English: | Thiolcarboxylic acid esters | [1988/27] | French: | Esters d'acides thiolcarboxyliques | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 11.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2093843 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]US4606864 (WARREN DAVID P [US]) |