EP0272150 - Register device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Ken-ichi c/o Patent Divison Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Mitsuo c/o Patent Divison Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Aikawa, Takeshi c/o Patent Divison Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Matoba, Tsukasa c/o Patent Divison Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 05 /
Okamura, Mitsuyoshi c/o Patent Divison Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311212.2 | 18.12.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | JP19860303443 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30344386 | [1988/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272150 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272150 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/42, G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
G06F9/30116 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F9/4486 (EP,US);
G06F9/462 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/25] | G06F9/42, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/25] | Title | German: | Registervorrichtung | [1988/25] | English: | Register device | [1988/25] | French: | Dispositif de registres | [1988/25] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/25] | 30.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/45] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4410939 (KAWAKAMI KATSURA [JP]); | [A]US3440619 (LEHMAN MEIR M, et al); | [A]EP0170284 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2156551 (HITACHI LTD) |