EP0273702 - Radiation hardening techniques for metal-oxide silicon devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wei, Ching-Yeu 14 Sussex Way Schenectady New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Woodbury, Henry Hugh 1008 Tecumseh Way Scotia New York 12302 / US | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald, et al GE/RCA Patent Operation Burdett House, 4th Floor 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | [1988/27] | Application number, filing date | 87311350.0 | 23.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | US19860947160 | 29.12.1986 Original published format: US 947160 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273702 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273702 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/10, H01L27/08, H01L21/76, H01L21/54 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
H01L21/266 (EP);
H01L21/76218 (EP);
H01L21/823878 (EP);
H01L27/0927 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/27] | H01L27/10, H01L21/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/27] | Title | German: | Technik um Metall-Oxid-Silizium Bauelemente gegen Strahlungen abzuhärten | [1988/27] | English: | Radiation hardening techniques for metal-oxide silicon devices | [1988/27] | French: | Technique pour augmenter la résistance aux radiations des dispositifs métal-oxyde-silicium | [1988/27] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/27] | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.12.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6031276 ; | [A]JPS61128533 | [AD] - IEEE TECHNICAL DIGEST INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICE MEETING. 1981pages 346-349; S.R. COMBS: "Scaleable Retrograde P-well Cmos Technology". | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN. vol. 9no. 150 (E-324)(1873) 25 June 1985; & JP-A-60 031 276 (TOSHIBA) 18-02-1985 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN. vol. 10no. 317 (E-449)(2373) 28 October 1986; & JP-A-61 128 533 (MITSUBISHI) 16-06-1986 | [A] - PHILIPS RESEARCH REPORTS. vol. 26, 1971, pages 157-165, EindhovenNetherlands; J.A. APPELS et al.: "Local oxidation of silicon: New Technological Aspects". |