EP0274898 - Implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1990 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinsch, Bernhard, Dr. Travestrasse 1 D-2000 Norderstedt / DE | 02 /
Walther, Christoph, Dr. AM Brahmberg 19 D-2358 Kattendorf / DE | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311363.3 | 23.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | DE19863644588 | 27.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3644588 | [1988/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274898 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274898 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP);
A61L27/48 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/48, A61L27/56, C08L67/04 (EP);
A61L27/48, C08L67/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Implantat | [1988/29] | English: | Implant | [1988/29] | French: | Implant | [1988/29] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/49] | 05.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.05.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8600533 [ ]; | EP0204931 [ ]; | WO8607250 [ ]; | EP0202444 [ ]; | EP0011528 [ ]; | GB200815 [ ]; | US4181983 [ ] |