EP0322487 - Article of dress [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofman, Velimir Slagenburg 10 NL-1082 JW Amsterdam / NL | [1989/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311438.3 | 24.12.1987 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322487 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322487 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0322487 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A41D1/06, A41D27/08 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
A41D17/02 (EP);
A41D1/06 (EP);
A41D27/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Bekleidungsartikel | [1989/27] | English: | Article of dress | [1989/27] | French: | Article d'habillement | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.1990 | 02.01.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.1992 | BE | 14.10.1992 | GR | 14.10.1992 | NL | 14.10.1992 | SE | 14.10.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/18] | AT | 14.10.1992 | |
BE | 14.10.1992 | ||
NL | 14.10.1992 | ||
SE | 14.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 14.10.1992 | |
NL | 14.10.1992 | ||
SE | 14.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | SE | 14.10.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2272622 (MOURET ROBERT [FR]); | [A]FR2361802 (SIKOR MARION [DE]); | [A]FR2475376 (FUSALP [FR]); | [X]GB2074438 (HOFMANN V) |