EP0275708 - Method for treating pineapples to inhibit opening of the pineapple flowers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obrero, Faustino P. P.O. Box 1833 Metro Manila / PH | For all designated states Schnitzler, Wilfred H. P.O. Box 1833 Metro Manila / PH | [1988/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/30] | Application number, filing date | 87311486.2 | 29.12.1987 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | US19860948236 | 31.12.1986 Original published format: US 948236 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0275708 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275708 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/16, A23B7/14, A23B7/00 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
A01N25/30 (EP,US);
A23B7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Ananas um das Öffnen der Ananas-Blüten zu verhindern | [1988/30] | English: | Method for treating pineapples to inhibit opening of the pineapple flowers | [1988/30] | French: | Méthode pour le traitement d'ananas pour empêcher l'ouverture des fleurs d'ananas | [1988/30] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 16.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55061758 ; | [A]DE2751394 (GIST BROCADES NV) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 98 (C-18)[580], 15th July 1980; & JP-A-55 061 758 (DAIICHI NOUZAI) 09-05-1980, & JP55061758 A 00000000 | [AD] - ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, 3rd edition, vol. 22, pages 332-336; John Wiley & Sons, New York, US; C. ARNO et al.: "Surfactants and detersive systems" |