EP0275716 - Transdermal estrogen/progestin dosage unit, and fertility control kit comprising said dosage unit. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/30] | Transdermal estrogen/progestin dosage unit, system and process | ||
[1995/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rutgers, The State University of New Jersey Old Queens Building Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states RUTGERS, THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY Old Queens Building Somerset and George Streets New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US | ||
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states Rutgers, The State University Old Queens Bldg. New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chien, Yie W. 5, West Lake Court North Brunswick, New Jersey 08902 / US | 02 /
Chien, Te-Yen 82, Nichols Apt., 900, Davidson Road Piscataway, New Jersey 08854 / US | 03 /
Huang, Yih-Chain 5, Bennington Place Piscataway, New Jersey 08854 / US | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Watkins, Arnold Jack, et al European Patent Attorney Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311508.3 | 29.12.1987 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | US19860947130 | 29.12.1986 Original published format: US 947130 | US19870131462 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: US 131462 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0275716 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275716 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/16, A61K31/565 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP);
A61K31/565 (EP);
A61K31/567 (EP);
A61K9/7092 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/30] | A61L15/03, A61K31/565 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/30] | Title | German: | Transdermale östrogen-/progestin-Einheitsdosis, Kit zur Fertilitätskontrolle enthaltend diese Einheitsdosis | [1995/32] | English: | Transdermal estrogen/progestin dosage unit, and fertility control kit comprising said dosage unit. | [1995/32] | French: | Unité de dosage transdermique estrogène/progestine et ensemble contraceptif comprenant cette unité. | [1995/32] |
Former [1988/30] | Transdermale Östrogen-/Progestin-Einheitsdosis, System und Verfahren | ||
Former [1988/30] | Transdermal estrogen/progestin dosage unit, system and process | ||
Former [1988/30] | Unité de dosage transdermique estrogène/progestine, système et procédé | Examination procedure | 03.05.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Request for further processing for: | 28.10.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3832252 (HIGUCHI T, et al); | [Y]US4145416 (LACHNIT-FIXSON URSULA, et al); | [Y]EP0196769 (UNIV RUTGERS [US]); | [Y]US4624665 (NUWAYSER ELIE S [US]) |