EP0237364 - Foldable arrangement for viewing a pair of stereoscopic pictures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEREOSCOPES LESTRADE et Cie. S.A. 10, avenue des Acacias F-65500 Vic-en-Bigorre / FR | [1987/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lestrade, Robert 17 Lotissement Batailles Route d'Artagnan F-65500 Vic-En-Bigorre / FR | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400030.0 | 09.01.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | FR19860000213 | 09.01.1986 Original published format: FR 8600213 | [1987/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237364 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/04, G02B27/22 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
G02B30/37 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Entfaltbare Vorrichtung zur Betrachtung eines stereoskopischen Bildpaares | [1987/38] | English: | Foldable arrangement for viewing a pair of stereoscopic pictures | [1987/38] | French: | Dispositif déployable pour visionner un couple de vues stéréoscopiques | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 29.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/44] | 14.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2986830 (UNDERBERG ROBERT L, et al); | [AD]FR2558605 (LESTRADE STEREOSCOPES [FR]) |