EP0233097 - Bag combined with a hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Achour, Aimé Samuel 10, Place Pinel F-75013 Paris / FR | [1987/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43 Rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al ARMENGAUD JEUNE CABINET LEPEUDRY 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400044.1 | 12.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | FR19860000353 | 13.01.1986 Original published format: FR 8600353 | [1987/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233097 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A45C15/00, A45F4/12, A45C9/00 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
A45F4/12 (EP);
A45C15/00 (EP);
A45C9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, LI [1987/34] | Title | German: | Mit einer Kopfbedeckung kombinierte Tasche | [1987/34] | English: | Bag combined with a hood | [1987/34] | French: | Sac combiné avec un capuchon | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 06.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 26.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3818158 ; | [A]US4060852 ; | [A]GB922723 ; | [A]BE557107 ; | [A]US2462269 ; | [A]FR1021569 ; | [A]DE1123803 ; | [A]US3275106 ; | [A]US2694812 ; | [A]US4301547 |