EP0233808 - Modular shelter and method of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMPENON BERNARD, Société Anonyme dite: 92-98, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92115 Clichy / FR | [1987/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prot, Christian 5, rue de la Grande Coudraie F-91190 Gif-Sur-Yvette / FR | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet de Boisse 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400129.0 | 20.01.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | FR19860000771 | 21.01.1986 Original published format: FR 8600771 | [1987/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233808 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04H9/12 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
E04H9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Modularer Schutzkeller und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [1987/35] | English: | Modular shelter and method of manufacturing same | [1987/35] | French: | Abri modulaire et son procédé de fabrication | [1987/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 02.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/43] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2499136 ; | [AD]FR2503777 ; | [A]FR1382540 ; | [A]GB2075570 ; | [A]FR2519366 |