EP0233116 - Plural stage catalytic reforming process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franck, Jean-Pierre 24, avenue Ivan Tourgueneff F-78300 Bougival / FR | 02 /
Bournonville, Jean-Paul 43, rue des Groues Vauréal F-95000 Cergy-Pontoise / FR | [1989/32] |
Former [1987/34] | 01 /
Franck, Jean-Pierre 24, avenue Ivan Tourgueneff F-78300 Bougival / FR | ||
02 /
Bournonville, Jean-Paul 43, rue des Groues Vauréal F-95000 Cergy Pontoise / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400221.5 | 30.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | FR19860001551 | 03.02.1986 Original published format: FR 8601551 | [1987/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233116 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233116 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10G59/02, C10G35/09 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
C10G35/09 (EP,US);
C10G59/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1987/34] | Title | German: | Katalytisches Reformierverfahren mit wenigstens zwei Katalysatorbetten | [1987/34] | English: | Plural stage catalytic reforming process | [1987/34] | French: | Procédé de reformage catalytique à travers au moins deux lits de catalyseur | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 23.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0153891 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [Y]FR2545380 (CATALYSE SOC PROD FRANCAIS [FR]); | [Y]FR2163683 (STANDARD OIL CO); | [Y]US4507401 (DUBOIS LAWRENCE H [US], et al) |